Global Patent Index - EP 0993517 A1

EP 0993517 A1 2000-04-19 - NOZZLE FOR CONVEYING A TEXTILE SKEIN AND FEEDING LIQUOR AND DEVICE FOR TREATING TEXTILES IN THE FORM OF AT LEAST ONE ENDLESS SKEIN WITH LIQUOR

Title (en)

NOZZLE FOR CONVEYING A TEXTILE SKEIN AND FEEDING LIQUOR AND DEVICE FOR TREATING TEXTILES IN THE FORM OF AT LEAST ONE ENDLESS SKEIN WITH LIQUOR

Title (de)

DÜSE ZUM TRANSPORT EINES TEXTILEN STRANGES UND ZUR ZUFUHR VON FLOTTE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEHANDELN VON TEXTILGUT IN FORM VON MINDESTENS EINEM ENDLOSEN STRANG MIT FLOTTE

Title (fr)

BUSE DE TRANSPORT D'UN BOYAU DE TEXTILE, ALIMENTATION D'UN BAIN ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'UN PRODUIT TEXTILE SOUS LA FORME AU MOINS D'UN BOYAU CONTINU A L'AIDE D'UN BAIN

Publication

EP 0993517 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936388 A

Priority

  • DE 19728420 A
  • EP 9803864 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19728420A1] Nozzles impinged upon by air as a conveyor medium for non-damaging conveyance of a skein and liquor feed devices arranged at the input of a textile material storage device are commonly used to treat textile materials in the form of a skein with liquor. However, only a part of the exiting liquor jets hits the skein which moves back and forth for folding purposes. Nozzles known per se also include those whose body is used to supply liquor so that they also serve as a medium of conveyance, thereby impinging upon the textile material with the added disadvantage that the liquor hits the skein while compressed. The aim of the invention is to provide a nozzle and a device which enable non-damaging, energy-efficient conveyance, in addition to using liquor effectively. The inventive nozzle is characterized by a liquor feed device (4) which is arranged on the introduction device (3) and which can pivot with the latter. One or several outlets (22) of the feed device (4) are directed at the skein (40) and are arranged at the rear end of the introduction device (3) so that liquor can exit in the form of a jet. The inventive device for treating textile material is provided with such a nozzle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901601A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728420 A1 19990107; DE 19728420 C2 20001102; DK 0993517 T3 20021007; EP 0993517 A1 20000419; EP 0993517 B1 20020612; ES 2178240 T3 20021216; KR 100472872 B1 20050307; KR 20010021491 A 20010315; PT 993517 E 20021129; TR 199902629 T2 20000221; WO 9901601 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070624

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080104

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070625

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070625

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070624

2008-02-18 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071226

2008-01-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20071226

2006-07-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-13 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060711

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060711

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060704

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178240 T3

2002-11-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: SUCKER-MULLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO. DE

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-11-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403071

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-08-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804435 20020718

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010913

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT