Global Patent Index - EP 0993518 A1

EP 0993518 A1 2000-04-19 - HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH A STAINLESS STEEL SUBASSEMBLY

Title (en)

HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH A STAINLESS STEEL SUBASSEMBLY

Title (de)

HAUSHALTGERÄT MIT EINER MEHRTEILIGEN BAUGRUPPE AUS EDELSTAHL

Title (fr)

APPAREIL MENAGER COMPORTANT UN ENSEMBLE MULTIPIECES EN ACIER SPECIAL

Publication

EP 0993518 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937470 A

Priority

  • DE 19728196 A
  • EP 9803515 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19728196A1] Washing machines, in particular those that can be loaded through their casing, have hinged lids on their stainless steel washing drums (1). The object of the invention is to secure the fixed attachments of such drum lids, such as hinges (11, 12), hooks (7, 8), etc. on the main body of the drum lid in a more permanent and less costly manner than in the prior art. This object is achieved in that the attachments are secured to the main part of the subassembly by laser weld seams (13, 14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/00 (2006.01); D06F 37/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901603A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728196 A1 19990107; AT 209269 T 20011215; BR 9810640 A 20000801; CN 1261934 A 20000802; EP 0993518 A1 20000419; EP 0993518 B1 20011121; ES 2168781 T3 20020616; RU 2176696 C2 20011210; TR 199903250 T2 20001121; WO 9901603 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802745

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120630

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090610

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030611

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030610

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168781 T3

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802745 20020221

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209269 T 20011215

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI