Global Patent Index - EP 0993520 A1

EP 0993520 A1 2000-04-19 - METHOD FOR DEHYDRATING SOLID-BASED LIQUID SUSPENSIONS, SPECIALLY FIBER-BASED SUSPENSIONS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DEHYDRATING SOLID-BASED LIQUID SUSPENSIONS, SPECIALLY FIBER-BASED SUSPENSIONS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTWÄSSERUNG VON FESTSTOFF-FLÜSSIGKEITSSUSPENSIONEN, INSBESONDERE FASERSTOFFSUSPENSIONEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR DESHYDRATER DES SUSPENSIONS A BASE DE SOLIDES ET DE LIQUIDES, NOTAMMENT DES SUSPENSIONS A BASE DE FIBRES

Publication

EP 0993520 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939587 A

Priority

  • AT 112297 A
  • EP 9804045 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901609A1] The invention relates to a device for dehydrating solid-based liquid suspensions, specially fiber-based suspensions. The suspension is dehydrated between two bands (4, 5). A dehydration zone is configured as a wedge-shaped area. The invention is chiefly characterized in that a surface contact pressure and a linear contact pressure are exerted by a pair of following rollers (21, 22) on the material strip formed from the fiber-based suspension.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/80; D21F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/02 (2006.01); D21F 1/80 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/04 (2013.01); D21F 1/80 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901609A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901609 A1 19990114; AT 404946 B 19990325; AT A112297 A 19980815; AU 8804798 A 19990125; BR 9810959 A 20000926; CA 2294903 A1 19990114; CA 2294903 C 20081021; CN 1134568 C 20040114; CN 1261937 A 20000802; DE 59805627 D1 20021024; EP 0993520 A1 20000419; EP 0993520 B1 20020918; JP 2002508813 A 20020319; JP 4461202 B2 20100512; US 6338773 B1 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030619

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805627

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-24

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-09-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991202

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE