Global patent index - EP 0993521 A1

EP 0993521 A1 2000-04-19 - METHOD FOR DEHYDRATING SOLID-BASED LIQUID SUSPENSIONS, SPECIALLY FIBER-BASED SUSPENSIONS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DEHYDRATING SOLID-BASED LIQUID SUSPENSIONS, SPECIALLY FIBER-BASED SUSPENSIONS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTWÄSSERUNG VON FESTSTOFF-FLÜSSIGKEITSSUSPENSIONEN, INSBESONDERE FASERSTOFFSUSPENSIONEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR DESHYDRATER DES SUSPENSIONS A BASE DE SOLIDES ET DE LIQUIDES, NOTAMMENT DES SUSPENSIONS A BASE DE FIBRES

Publication

EP 0993521 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939588 A

Priority

  • AT 112097 A
  • EP 9804046 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901610A1] The invention relates to a device for dehydrating solid-based liquid suspensions, specially fiber-based suspensions. The suspension is dehydrated between two bands (4, 5). A dehydration zone is configured as a wedge-shaped area. The invention is chiefly characterized in that the upper and/or lower deflection roller (21, 22) is designed as a tightening roller at the beginning of the wedge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/80; D21F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/02 (2006.01); D21F 1/80 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/80 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901610A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901610 A1 19990114; AT 405656 B 19991025; AT A112097 A 19990215; AU 8804898 A 19990125; BR 9810512 A 20000905; CA 2294389 A1 19990114; CA 2294389 C 20071030; CN 1105804 C 20030416; CN 1261936 A 20000802; DE 59803866 D1 20020523; EP 0993521 A1 20000419; EP 0993521 B1 20020417; JP 2002508814 A 20020319; JP 4339412 B2 20091007

INPADOC legal status

2011-01-25 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2010-11-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20091217

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER SUNDSVALL AB

- Effective date: 20030113

2009-04-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER SUNDSVALL AB

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-03-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER SUNDSVALL ABMESTO PAPER SUNDSVALL AB

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803866

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-23

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-01-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR DEHYDRATING SOLID-BASED LIQUID SUSPENSIONS, IN PARTICULAR FIBER-BASED SUSPENSIONS

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991202

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE