Global Patent Index - EP 0993535 A2

EP 0993535 A2 2000-04-19 - DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING MECHANICAL CONTROL MOVEMENTS AND/OR ELECTRIC SIGNALS BETWEEN A DOOR ACTUATING DEVICE AND A DOOR CLOSER DEVICE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING MECHANICAL CONTROL MOVEMENTS AND/OR ELECTRIC SIGNALS BETWEEN A DOOR ACTUATING DEVICE AND A DOOR CLOSER DEVICE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR

Title (de)

ÜBERTRAGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR MECHANISCHE STELLBEWEGUNGEN UND/ODER ELEKTRISCHE SIGNALE ZWISCHEN EINER TÜRBETÄTIGUNGS- UND EINER TÜRZUHALTEVORRICHTUNG EINER KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE TRANSMETTRE DES MOUVEMENTS DE COMMANDE MECANIQUES ET/OU DES SIGNAUX ELECTRIQUES ENTRE UN DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT ET UN DISPOSITIF D'ARRET DE PORTIERE D'AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 0993535 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98941277 A

Priority

  • DE 9801861 W
  • DE 19728967 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19728967A1] The invention relates to a device for transmitting mechanical control movements and/or electric signals between a door actuating device (3) and a door closer device (4) of a motor vehicle door for ensuring the mechanical functions of opening/closing and locking/unlocking as well as electric lock functions. A single-piece coupling element (5), which can be displaced in a translational or rotatory manner and mechanically and/or electrically transmits both door functions between the door actuating device (3) and the door closure device (4), comprises at least one connector which can be joined to an electrical contact point positioned on the door closer device (4) or the support plate. Said electrical contact point can transmit the control signals for both door functions or for only one door function while the other door function can be transmitted in a rotatory or translational manner via the coupling element (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 17/04; E05B 49/00; E05B 65/36; H01B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 7/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 79/20 (2014.01); E05B 81/76 (2014.01); E05B 83/36 (2014.01); E05B 85/06 (2014.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/04 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01); E05B 77/34 (2014.01); E05B 85/10 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/36 (2013.01); E05B 79/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/76 (2013.01); E05B 85/06 (2013.01); E05B 17/04 (2013.01); E05B 17/041 (2013.01); E05B 53/00 (2013.01); E05B 77/34 (2013.01); E05B 85/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901635A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728967 A1 19990107; DE 19728967 C2 20010705; EP 0993535 A2 20000419; EP 0993535 B1 20020327; ES 2175757 T3 20021116; US 6552659 B1 20030422; WO 9901635 A2 19990114; WO 9901635 A3 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060608

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-07-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-06-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030604

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2175757

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803530

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-02

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010726

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991228

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE