Global patent index - EP 0993546 A1

EP 0993546 A1 2000-04-19 - METHOD FOR REGULATING HEAT IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REGULATING HEAT IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRMEREGULIERUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGULATION THERMIQUE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0993546 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98938667 A

Priority

  • DE 19728351 A
  • EP 9803945 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19728351A1] The invention relates to a method for regulating the heat of an internal combustion engine in motor vehicles with electrically controllable devices designed to convey cooling or heating agents and to adjust the volumetric flow thereof. Temperature sensors at several points on the internal combustion engine generate temperature-dependent signals which are processed by means of at least one microprocessor into adjustment signals for the devices. According to the invention, in addition to temperatures of cooling and heating agents, critical temperature components and/or output characteristics of the internal combustion engine are detected and taken into account during regulation, specifically relating to heat behavior. This enables quick regulation response to heat, wherein warm-up times are shortened and optimal operational temperature times are extended.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 7/16 (2006.01); F01P 5/10 (2006.01); F01P 5/12 (2006.01); F01P 7/04 (2006.01); F01P 7/08 (2006.01); F01P 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 7/164 (2013.01); F01P 7/167 (2013.01); F01P 7/048 (2013.01); F01P 7/08 (2013.01); F01P 7/12 (2013.01); F01P 2005/105 (2013.01); F01P 2005/125 (2013.01); F01P 2023/00 (2013.01); F01P 2023/08 (2013.01); F01P 2025/30 (2013.01); F01P 2025/31 (2013.01); F01P 2025/32 (2013.01); F01P 2025/33 (2013.01); F01P 2025/50 (2013.01); F01P 2060/04 (2013.01); F01P 2060/08 (2013.01); F01P 2060/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901650A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728351 A1 19990107; DE 19728351 B4 20040722; EP 0993546 A1 20000419; EP 0993546 B1 20011205; JP 2000512364 A 20000919; JP 3785510 B2 20060614; US 6343572 B1 20020205; WO 9901650 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802355

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140829

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070627

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060627

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060627

2005-06-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050610

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802355

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010521

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991117

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT