Global patent index - EP 0993552 A1

EP 0993552 A1 2000-04-19 - LIQUID RING PUMP

Title (en)

LIQUID RING PUMP

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITSRINGPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE A ANNEAU LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 0993552 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936207 A

Priority

  • DE 9801664 W
  • DE 19727719 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19727719C1] The invention relates to a liquid ring pump (12), consisting of at least one drive unit, said drive unit having a drive shaft (3), a working area housing, a rotating impeller (1) which can move freely axially on said drive shaft (3) and which is located in said housing, and a disc cam (8). Said disc cam (8) has passages in the area of the front face of the drive shaft for the exchange of sealing liquid (10) and for ventilation. Said passages allowing the exchange of sealing fluid and said free axial movement enable the impeller (1) to adjust itself during operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 19/00; F04C 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 19/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 19/004 (2013.01); F04C 19/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901668A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727719 C1 19980625; CN 1080836 C 20020313; CN 1249802 A 20000405; EP 0993552 A1 20000419; EP 0993552 B1 20040107; JP 2000512363 A 20000919; US 6287082 B1 20010911; WO 9901668 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080617

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810554

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-01-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NASH-ELMO INDUSTRIES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NASH-ELMO INDUSTRIES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020222

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT