Global Patent Index - EP 0993555 A1

EP 0993555 A1 2000-04-19 - APPARATUS FOR CONDITIONING AIR

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR CONDITIONING AIR

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR LUFTBEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR

Publication

EP 0993555 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98932618 A

Priority

  • NL 9800378 W
  • NL 1006451 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901669A1] An apparatus for conditioning air comprises a casing (1) provided with an air flow channel (4) and with a fan comprising a drive unit (11), which is mounted in said channel (4). Humidifying means are fitted with a number of humidifying elements (13) which rotate about a shaft (9), partially within said air channel (4) and partially in water supply means (8). The fan is provided with air flow elements (12), which rotate independently of said humidifying elements (13). The humidifying elements (13) and the air flow elements (12) are disposed at least approximately concentrically or coaxially with respect to each other, preferably near the air flow elements (12) and within the sphere of action thereof. The air flow elements (12) are for example disposed internally of the annular humidifying elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 17/16; F04D 31/00; F24F 6/06; F24F 6/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 31/00 (2006.01); F24F 6/06 (2006.01); F24F 6/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 6/16 (2013.01); F04D 17/161 (2013.01); F04D 31/00 (2013.01); F24F 6/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901669A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901669 A1 19990114; AU 8245598 A 19990125; DE 69821484 D1 20040311; DE 69821484 T2 20041125; EP 0993555 A1 20000419; EP 0993555 B1 20040204; NL 1006451 C2 19990105

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040702

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-07-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821484 P 20040311

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB