Global Patent Index - EP 0993589 A1

EP 0993589 A1 2000-04-19 - IGNITER

Title (en)

IGNITER

Title (de)

ANZÜNDER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ALLUMAGE

Publication

EP 0993589 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941246 A

Priority

  • DE 9801779 W
  • DE 19729437 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902937A1] An igniter, in particular for triggering motor vehicle passenger protection means, has an integrated circuit arrangement (21) for controlling an igniting element (31) designed as a semiconductor chip (2) and an integrated capacitor (11) for providing the energy required for igniting also designed as a semiconductor chip (1). Both chips (1, 2) are stacked in a capsule of the igniter containing an igniting powder. The dimensions of a conventional igniter can thus be maintained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/16 (2006.01); F42B 3/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902937A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902937 A1 19990121; EP 0993589 A1 20000419; EP 0993589 B1 20021002; JP 2000513799 A 20001017; JP 3648256 B2 20050518; KR 100396964 B1 20030902

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090629

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090629

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090629

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805824 20021107

2002-10-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT