Global Patent Index - EP 0993671 A1

EP 0993671 A1 2000-04-19 - METHOD FOR SEARCHING A NOISE MODEL IN NOISY SOUND SIGNALS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SEARCHING A NOISE MODEL IN NOISY SOUND SIGNALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES RAUSCHMODELLS IN EINEM GESTÖRTEN AUDIOSIGNAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RECHERCHE D'UN MODELE DE BRUIT DANS DES SIGNAUX SONORES BRUITES

Publication

EP 0993671 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98935094 A

Priority

  • FR 9801428 W
  • FR 9708509 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2765715A1] The invention mainly concerns noise reduction of sound signals in a noisy environment, for example in an aircraft pilot's cockpit or any other vehicle, and more precisely it concerns the search for a noise model in sound signals. The method consists in digitising the input signals and processing these signals from a noise model in order to eliminate as far as possible the noise corresponding to the model. The input signals are strobed in successive patterns of P samples each, and an iterative search of a noise model is permanently carried out in the input signals themselves, searching N successive patterns (N ranging between a minimum N1 and a maximum N2) having the expected characteristics of a noise, by storing the NxP corresponding samples to constitute a noise model useful for the noise reduction processing of the input signals, and by repeating the search to find a new noise model and storing the new noise model to replace the previous one or keeping the previous one according to the respective characteristics of the two models. The model is obtained by finding N patterns whereof the energy contents are close to one another (the energy contents ratio being between two values S and 1/S).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/20 (2006.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 21/0216 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 2021/02168 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901862A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2765715 A1 19990108; FR 2765715 B1 19990917; DE 69806006 D1 20020718; DE 69806006 T2 20021219; EP 0993671 A1 20000419; EP 0993671 B1 20020612; JP 2002513479 A 20020508; JP 4338226 B2 20091007; US 6438513 B1 20020820; WO 9901862 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100703

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69806006

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100703

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090701

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090705

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-09-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806006 20020718

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 21/02 A

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES AVIONICS S.A.

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL