Global patent index - EP 0993715 A1

EP 0993715 A1 2000-04-19 - TAGGING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS

Title (en)

TAGGING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON MARKIERUNGEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE MARQUAGE

Publication

EP 0993715 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98926429 A

Priority

  • US 9811839 W
  • US 87175497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857459A1] An ultraviolet laser scanner (15) scans the target (10) to detect the encoding. The output of the ultraviolet laser scanner (15) is monitored by the laser monitor (40) and by the background monitor (20). In addition, filters and detectors (25) are used along with a spectrometer with electronics and at least one display (30). The vertical dashed line separates a fluorescent tag detection portion of the device on the left from the bar code reading portion on the right.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/60 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857459 A1 19981217; AU 739620 B2 20011018; AU 7827098 A 19981230; CA 2295967 A1 19981217; EP 0993715 A1 20000419; EP 0993715 A4 20020821

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-24 [R18W] WITHDRAWAL (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18W

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-07-23 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18W

2003-07-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030514

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISOTAG TECHNOLOGY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04L 9/00 A, 7G 06K 19/14 B

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE