Global Patent Index - EP 0993845 A2

EP 0993845 A2 2000-04-19 - Process and system for monitoring the posture of the user of a training device

Title (en)

Process and system for monitoring the posture of the user of a training device

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zum Überwachen der Haltung eines Benutzers an einem Trainingsgerät

Title (fr)

Procédé et système pour surveiller la posture de l'utilisateur d'un appareil d'entrainement

Publication

EP 0993845 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119383 A

Priority

DE 19846982 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves using a sensor (1), which detects a kinematic parameter during the use of the working-out machine (9) by the user. The parameter is evaluated and a wrong posture is determined during the use of the machine. Preferably, several sensors can be used at the user using a carrier belt or several sensors can be used at the working-out machine. The position, the speed or the acceleration is determined as the parameter during the use of the machine. The determined parameter is compared with reference data for evaluating a wrong posture.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren und System zum Überwachen der Haltung eines Benutzers während der Benutzung eines Trainingsgeräts (9). Am Körper des Benutzers und eventuell an bestimmten Stellen des Trainingsgeräts (9) werden Sensoren (1) zur Erfassung bestimmter kinematischer Kennwerte angebracht, wobei die von diesen Sensoren (1) erfaßten Meßdaten in einer Auswerteeinrichtung (2) analysiert werden, um eine fehlerhafte Bewegung oder Haltung des Benutzers während der Benutzung des Trainingsgeräts (9) zu erkennen und in diesem Fall dem Benutzer oder dem Trainingsgerät (9) eine entsprechende Rückmeldung (15) auszugeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 24/00; A61B 5/103

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 24/00 (2006.01); A63B 23/02 (2006.01); A63B 23/04 (2006.01); A63B 69/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 23/0244 (2013.01); A63B 24/00 (2013.01); A63B 23/0417 (2013.01); A63B 2024/0012 (2013.01); A63B 2069/064 (2013.01); A63B 2071/0072 (2013.01); A63B 2071/0081 (2013.01); A63B 2071/0655 (2013.01); Y10S 482/901 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993845 A2 20000419; EP 0993845 A3 20020821; EP 0993845 B1 20051221; DE 19846982 A1 20000420; DE 19846982 C2 20010517; US 6682351 B1 20040127

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180110

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170912

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912956 P 20060126

2006-01-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-12-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040722

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63B 24/00 A, 7A 61B 5/103 B, 7A 63B 23/02 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI