Global Patent Index - EP 0993846 A1

EP 0993846 A1 2000-04-19 - Paddle attached to the hand for use in aquatic environments

Title (en)

Paddle attached to the hand for use in aquatic environments

Title (de)

An der Hand befestigtes Paddelblatt zur Verwendung in Wasser

Title (fr)

Plaquettes palmaires destinées à être fixées aux mains des utilisateurs en milieu aquatique

Publication

EP 0993846 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99390020 A

Priority

  • FR 9812911 A
  • US 23525599 A

Abstract (en)

The paddle (1) is attached to a swimmers hand by loops (2,3). An internally mounted microprocessor is mounted within the paddle that measures and records a number of different pre-set parameters.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention a pour objet des plaquettes palmaires destinées à être fixées aux mains des utilisateurs en milieu aquatique. Chacune des plaquettes est constituée d'une paroi (1) de forme adaptée sur laquelle repose la main et qui est dotée de moyens de fixation (2-3). L'invention se caractérise en ce que au moins l'une des plaquettes est dotée d'au moins un capteur (4) dont le signal est transmis à un microprocesseur capable de calculer un certain nombre de paramètres qui sont mémorisés et qui peuvent s'afficher sur un écran de lecture, le microprocesseur, son électronique et l'écran étant portés par la palette. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 31/10; A63B 69/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 31/10 (2006.01); A63B 69/12 (2006.01); A63B 24/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 31/10 (2013.01); A63B 69/12 (2013.01); A63B 2220/833 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993846 A1 20000419; FR 2784590 A1 20000421; FR 2784590 B1 20010518; US 6183396 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020102

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI