Global Patent Index - EP 0993852 A2

EP 0993852 A2 2000-04-19 - Joint connection

Title (en)

Joint connection

Title (de)

Knotenverbindung

Title (fr)

Noeud d'assemblage

Publication

EP 0993852 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116326 A

Priority

DE 19847775 A

Abstract (en)

A T-joint, comprising rods (12) joined by a solid adhesive (14) of renewable raw materials molded around the joint (10), is new. An Independent claim is also included for producing the above T-joint by wetting or moistening the adhesive and then molding it about the rods.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Knotenverbindung (10) von Stäben (12) für den Spielbereich. Die Erfindung schlägt vor, die Knotenverbindung (10) mit einem Feststoffkleber (14) herzustellen, der auf Maisgries- oder Maismehlbasis durch Extrudieren als fester Schaum hergestellt ist. Die Verklebung erfolgt durch Anfeuchten des Feststoffklebers (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 33/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993852 A2 20000419; EP 0993852 A3 20030122; DE 19847775 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050803

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63H 33/14 A, 7C 09J 5/00 B, 7C 09J 103/00 B, 7C 09J 189/00 B, 7F 16B 7/00 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI