Global Patent Index - EP 0993864 A1

EP 0993864 A1 2000-04-19 - Apparatus and method for mixing and dispensing several fluid components

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for mixing and dispensing several fluid components

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Durchführung einer mischenden Abgabe von mehreren fliessfähigen Komponenten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de mélanger et délivrer plusieurs composants fluides

Publication

EP 0993864 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810789 A

Priority

  • EP 99810789 A
  • EP 98810934 A

Abstract (en)

The transition piece (3) has a symmetrical axis about which it can rotate or can be inserted into the transition part (11) in a number of discrete points of rotation with respect to the housing, so that on assembling in one of the possible points of rotation, it can be ranged in the mixer structure or in the coupling device in the transition part (11). The apparatus for feeding of a mixer of several free-flowing components from several chamber vessels (2), has a housing (1) on which the vessel contacts, having an outlet (12), a reducer portion (11) on which the vessel is coupled and a pipe section (10) between the reducer and outlet; a static mixer (4) composed of an extendible pipe section (10); a reducer (3) having a reducer portion, the reducer forming separated feeding channels (31,31') from the inlet (21,21') of the container to the mixing device (4) and a flow of components is possible only through these feeding canals; and a coupling device (15) for separable securing the housing on the vessel.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung zur Durchführung einer mischenden Abgabe von mehreren fliessfähigen Komponenten aus einem mehrkammerigen Behältnis (2) umfasst folgende Teile: ein auf das Behältnis aufsetzbares Gehäuse (1) mit einer Austrittsöffnung (12), einem an das Behältnis ankoppelbaren Übergangsteil (11) und einem rohrartigen Teil (10) zwischen Übergangsteil und Austrittsöffnung; einen statischen Mischer (4), der aus einer in den rohrartigen Teil einschiebbaren Struktur besteht; ein im Übergangsteil angeordnetes Übergangsstück (3), das getrennte Zuführkanäle (31, 31') von Austrittsöffnungen (21, 21') des Behältnisses zu der Mischerstruktur (4) herstellt und das ein Fliessen der Komponenten nur durch diese Zuführkanäle zulässt; und ferner ein Ankoppelmittel (15) zum lösbaren Befestigen des Gehäuses an dem Behältnis. Das Übergangsstück (3) dieser Vorrichtung weist eine Symmetrieachse auf, bezüglich der es drehbar oder in einer Mehrzahl von diskreten Drehstellungen in das Übergangsteil (11) einsetzbar ist, und zwar derart, dass es sich bei der Montage in einer der möglichen Drehstellungen beliebig bezüglich dem Gehäuse (1), der Mischerstruktur (4) sowie dem Ankoppelmittel (15) in dem Übergangsteil (11) anordnen lässt. Die Symmetrieachse weist in Richtung des rohrartigen Teils (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 13/00; B01F 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00513 (2013.01); B05C 17/00506 (2013.01); B05C 17/00516 (2013.01); B05C 17/00553 (2013.01); B65D 81/325 (2013.01); B01F 2215/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993864 A1 20000419

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020322

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI