Global Patent Index - EP 0993876 A1

EP 0993876 A1 2000-04-19 - Process for applying a coloured decoration onto a substrate

Title (en)

Process for applying a coloured decoration onto a substrate

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufbringen eines Farbdekors auf ein Substrat

Title (fr)

Procédé d'application d'un décor coloré sur un substrat

Publication

EP 0993876 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98119331 A

Priority

EP 98119331 A

Abstract (en)

The colour layer (12) is applied to a flat surface carrier having a release property and a first varnish layer (14) is then applied to the colour layer. The varnish layer is partially cross-linked and then together with the decor layer is transferred from the carrier to the substrate (18) so that the varnish underneath the decor layer rests on the substrate and the carrier is then removed from the colour decor. A further varnish layer (20) is then applied over the colour decor on the substrate and the two varnish layers are then completely hardened. Partial cross-linking is carried out by UV radiation

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zum Aufbringen eines Farbdekors (12) auf ein Substrat (18) sieht folgende Schritte vor: a) ein diffundierbare Dispersionsfarbstoffe aufweisendes Farbdekor (12) wird auf einen flächigen Träger (10) mit "Release"-Eigenschaft aufgebracht, b) über das auf den Träger (10) aufgebrachte Farbdekor (12) wird eine erste Lackschicht (14) oder ein Kleber aufgetragen, c) der aufgetragene Lack (14) wird teilvernetzt bzw. Der Kleber wird getrocknet, d) der teilvernetzte Lack (14) bzw. Kleber mitsamt dem Farbdekor (12) wird vom Träger (10) auf das Substrat (18) so übertragen, daß der Lack (14) bzw. Kleber unter dem Farbdekor (12) auf dem Substrat (18) aufliegt und der Träger (10) vom Farbdekor (12) entfernt wird, e) über das auf das Substrat (18) übertragene Farbdekor (12) wird eine weitere Lackschicht (20) aufgetragen, und f) die Lackschichten (14, 20) werden vollständig gehärtet bzw. der Kleber aktiviert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/28; B44C 1/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/28 (2006.01); B44C 1/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/1745 (2013.01); B05D 1/286 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993876 A1 20000419; EP 0993876 B1 20040303; DE 59810918 D1 20040408; ES 2213248 T3 20040816

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071013

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051004

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061014

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061014

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061013

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-07-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061013

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051013

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051004

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051004

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213248 T3

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810918 P 20040408

2004-03-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR APPLYING A COLOURED DECORATION ONTO A SUBSTRATE

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021203

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI