Global patent index - EP 0993878 A2

EP 0993878 A2 2000-04-19 - Method for evacuating gases originating from welding and device for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for evacuating gases originating from welding and device for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Abführen von beim Schweissen entstehenden Gasen und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'évacuation des gaz de soudage et dispositif pour mettre en oeuvre le procédé

Publication

EP 0993878 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118758 A

Priority

DE 19847724 A

Abstract (en)

One or more air curtains (6) with an approximately vertical flow are placed either side of the longitudinal extensions of the component parts (2) being processed to produce a coanda effect at the surface. After being drawn off from the surfaces of the component parts the air curtains are then cleaned. Independent claim describes apparatus with one or more ventilator units (5) producing the air curtains which can be switched on individually. The supply nozzles can be partially closed and swivelled round.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Abführen von beim Schweißen entstehenden Gasen und Rauch an annähernd senkrecht angeordneten Bauteilen, insbesondere Rohbaukarosserien für Kraftfahrzeuge und dgl. sowie eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens. Durch die Erfindung sollen die beim Schweißen entstehenden Gase und Rauch zwischen Entstehungsstelle und Werker ständig gebunden und abtransportiert werden. Dadurch sollen gesundheitliche Schäden und Leistungsminderungen beim Werker vermieden werden. Erfindungsgemäß werden beidseitig der Längsausdehnungen der Bauteile (2) der Rohbaukarosserie je ein oder mehrere annähernd senkrecht strömende Luftschleier (6) unter Nutzung des Coanda-Effektes an deren Oberfläche angelegt, nach Verlassen der Bauteiloberflächen abgesaugt und anschließend gereinigt. Vorteilhaft ist die Strömungsrichtung von unten nach oben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 15/00; F24F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 15/00 (2006.01); F24F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 9/00 (2013.01); B08B 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3800050 A1 19880714 - ACIERA S A [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993878 A2 20000419; EP 0993878 A3 20011031; DE 19847724 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI