Global Patent Index - EP 0993881 A2

EP 0993881 A2 2000-04-19 - Constrained hardening method and apparatus for deformed bar workpieces

Title (en)

Constrained hardening method and apparatus for deformed bar workpieces

Title (de)

Zwangsabschreck - und Wärmebehandlungsverfahren und -vorrichtung für verzogene stabförmige Werkstücke

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de durcissement à contrainte et de traitement thermique pour des pièces en forme de barre déformées

Publication

EP 0993881 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99120283 A

Priority

JP 30320298 A

Abstract (en)

Hardening by heating a longitudinal section of a workpiece of a deformed-shape bar and quenching while constraining the workpiece section in dies, wherein the quenching is executed while the workpiece being pressed toward a direction perpendicular to its longitudinal direction by a pressing means which is installed adjacent to the workpiece section constrained in the dies. Warping by quenching can be minimized in deformed-shape workpieces as an automobile steering rack bar, wherein warping is difficult to prevent completely in prior constrained quenching process. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 3/16; C21D 1/673

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/10 (2006.01); C21D 1/18 (2006.01); C21D 1/55 (2006.01); C21D 1/673 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/673 (2013.01); C21D 9/0068 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993881 A2 20000419; EP 0993881 A3 20001004; EP 0993881 B1 20040128; DE 69914433 D1 20040304; DE 69914433 T2 20040715; JP 2000119739 A 20000425; JP 3007338 B1 20000207; US 6328829 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171004

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091011

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080916

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914433 P 20040304

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NETUREN CO., LTD.

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030203

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010307

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21D 3/16 A, 7C 21D 1/673 B, 7C 21D 9/00 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI