Global Patent Index - EP 0993888 A3

EP 0993888 A3 2001-05-30 - Forging machine

Title (en)

Forging machine

Title (de)

Schmiedemaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à forger

Publication

EP 0993888 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890320 A

Priority

AT 170998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0993888A2] Each forging ram is provided with a separate drive which by means of a control unit is controllable and regulatable with respect to the speed and phase angle of its rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 7/14; B21J 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 7/46 (2006.01); B21J 7/14 (2006.01); B21J 7/28 (2006.01); B21J 9/18 (2006.01); B30B 1/26 (2006.01); B30B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 7/14 (2013.01); B21J 9/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993888 A2 20000419; EP 0993888 A3 20010530; AT 406648 B 20000725; AT A170998 A 19991215; JP 2000117382 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI