Global Patent Index - EP 0993932 A2

EP 0993932 A2 2000-04-19 - Press with toggle drive

Title (en)

Press with toggle drive

Title (de)

Presse mit kniehebelantrieb

Title (fr)

Presse entrainée par genouillère

Publication

EP 0993932 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120146 A

Priority

DE 19846951 A

Abstract (en)

The press has a support arm (15) connected at one end to a press frame (10), and a drive arm (24) connected at one end to a work ram (26) guided on the press frame. A triangular guide rod (19) is connected at one end to a crank drive (22) and is fitted at its other end with the drive arm on the work ram side and with the support arm (15) on the frame side to form elbow joints (23, 18) spaced from each other. The length of the triangular guide rod between the elbow joint and crank drive is adjustable. The crank drive is driven by a worm gearing (35) from a motor such as an electric motor

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Presse mit einem Kniehebelantrieb, der einen mit einem Ende an einem Pressengestell (10) angelenkten Stützschenkel (15), einem mit einem Ende an einem am Pressengestell (10) geführten Arbeitsstößel (26) angelenkten Antriebsschenkel (24), sowie einen Dreieckslenker (19) aufweist, der mit einem Ende an einem Kurbelantrieb (22) angelenkt ist, und an dessen anderem Ende der Antriebsschenkel (24) arbeitsstößelseitig und der Stützschenkel (15) gestellseitig mit ihren jeweiligen anderen Enden unter Bildung von Kniegelenkpunkten (23, 18) mit Abstand zueinander angelenkt sind. Um bei einem möglichst einfachen Aufbau der Presse diese an vielfältiger Arbeitsaufgaben schnell anpassen zu können, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß die Länge des Dreiecklenkers (19) zwischen Kniegelenk und Kurbelantrieb (22) verstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 1/14 (2006.01); B30B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/0035 (2013.01); B30B 1/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993932 A2 20000419; EP 0993932 A3 20000426; DE 19846951 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020501

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 30B 1/14 A, 7B 30B 15/00 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI