Global Patent Index - EP 0993933 A3

EP 0993933 A3 2000-05-24 - Method of manufacturing multiple walled, preferably double walled, plastic bags

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing multiple walled, preferably double walled, plastic bags

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von mehrwandigen, vorzugsweise doppelwandigen Kunststoffbeuteln

Title (fr)

Méthode de production de sac plastique à paroi multiple, en particulier à paroi double

Publication

EP 0993933 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118937 A

Priority

DE 19847321 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0993933A2] Several (e.g. two) double-layer film webs (4,6) with a width half that of the single-layer web are unwound from rolls (3,5) and unfolded to full width. The single-layer webs are laid on top of each other, then folded into a U, and then plastic bags are made from the folded webs using known plastic bag manufacturing techniques.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 39/00; B31B 39/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 23/00 (2006.01); B31B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 70/00 (2017.08); B31B 2160/10 (2017.08); B31B 70/18 (2017.08); B31B 2155/00 (2017.08); B31B 2170/20 (2017.08); Y10S 493/922 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993933 A2 20000419; EP 0993933 A3 20000524; EP 0993933 B1 20030723; CA 2285819 A1 20000414; DE 19847321 A1 20000427; ES 2204043 T3 20040416; US 6416452 B1 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040927

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040925

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040925

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204043 T3

2003-09-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030904

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030903

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906341 P 20030828

2003-08-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB LI

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI