Global Patent Index - EP 0993945 A1

EP 0993945 A1 2000-04-19 - Heat-mode driographic printing plate precursor

Title (en)

Heat-mode driographic printing plate precursor

Title (de)

Im Wärmeverfahren arbeitendes Aufzeichnungsmaterial zur Herstellung von Druckplatten, welche kein Anfeuchtwasser benötigen

Title (fr)

Matériau d'enregistrement thermosensible pour la production de plaques lithographiques à sec

Publication

EP 0993945 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202797 A

Priority

  • EP 99202797 A
  • EP 98203497 A

Abstract (en)

A heat-mode exposable imaging material is disclosed which is suitable for making a driographic printing master capable of accepting ink at exposed areas, said material comprising (i) a first layer containing more than 50% by weight of carbon or of an organic light absorbing compound, and (ii) an ink-abhesive second layer underlying said first layer, characterised in that said first layer is removable at non-exposed areas by starting a pressrun without substantially removing said second layer. In a preferred embodiment, the material comprises a support, a silicone coating and a surface coating which consists essentially of carbon, soot or graphite. After heat-mode exposure, the material is ink accepting at exposed areas and the surface coating is removed at non-exposed areas during the start of a pressrun, thereby revealing the silicone coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1016 (2013.01); B41C 1/1033 (2013.01); B41C 2201/04 (2013.01); B41C 2201/14 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/16 (2016.11); B41C 2210/20 (2013.01); B41C 2210/22 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993945 A1 20000419; EP 0993945 B1 20040506

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69916960

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-04-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-13 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916960 P 20040609

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI