Global Patent Index - EP 0993956 A2

EP 0993956 A2 2000-04-19 - Linear translation system dithering for improved image quality

Title (en)

Linear translation system dithering for improved image quality

Title (de)

Zitterung eines Linearführungssystems für verbesserte Bildqualität

Title (fr)

Tremblement d'un système de translation linéaire pour l'amélioration d'un image

Publication

EP 0993956 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202685 A

Priority

US 14412398 A

Abstract (en)

An image processing apparatus (10) for sheet thermal print media comprises a vacuum imaging drum (300) for holding thermal print media (32) and dye donor material (36) in registration on vacuum imaging drum (300). A printhead (500) moves along a line parallel to a longitudinal axis of vacuum imaging drum (300) by a linear motion control system (900) which is interrupted with a random delay as vacuum imaging drum (300) rotates. Printhead (500) receives information signals and produces radiation which is directed to dye donor material (36) which causes color to transfer from dye donor material (36) to thermal print media (32). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/32 (2006.01); B41J 11/42 (2006.01); B41J 13/22 (2006.01); B41J 19/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 19/16 (2013.01); B41J 11/42 (2013.01); B41J 13/226 (2013.01); B41J 19/202 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993956 A2 20000419; EP 0993956 A3 20020102; JP 2000071488 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040128

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 19/20 A, 7B 41J 2/325 B, 7B 41J 2/45 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI