Global Patent Index - EP 0993966 A1

EP 0993966 A1 2000-04-19 - Negativ-working radiation-sensitive mixture for the production of a recording material which is imageable by heat or infrared laser beams

Title (en)

Negativ-working radiation-sensitive mixture for the production of a recording material which is imageable by heat or infrared laser beams

Title (de)

Negativ arbeitendes, strahlungsempfindliches Gemisch zur Herstellung eines mit Wärme oder Infrarotlaser bebilderbaren Aufzeichnungsmaterials

Title (fr)

Mélange sensible aux radiations, de type négatif pour la fabrication d'un support d'enregistrement permettant la formation d'images par la chaleur ou sous l'action de rayons lasers infrarouges

Publication

EP 0993966 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119798 A

Priority

DE 19847033 A

Abstract (en)

In a negative-working radiation sensitive mixture of an organic polymeric binder and a substance converting radiant energy into heat, the binder comprises units of 40-80 mol. % vinyl acetal, 15-30 mol. % vinyl alcohol and 1-10 mol. % monovinyl ester of a polycarboxylic acid and has an acid number of 5-150. In a negative-working radiation sensitive mixture of an organic polymeric binder and a substance converting radiant energy into heat, the binder comprises units of 40-80 mol. % vinyl acetal, 15-30 mol. % vinyl alcohol and 1-10 mol. % monovinyl ester of a polycarboxylic acid of formula (I) and has an acid number of 5-150: R<1> = hydrogen (H) or 1-4 carbon (C) alkyl; X = a single bond or (q+1)-valent residue of a 4-10 C alkane, in which individual methylene groups may be replaced by hetero-atoms, a 2-8 C alkene or an iso- or heterocyclic, (un)saturated mono- or polycyclic 6-10 C ring (system); n = 40-80 mol. %; m = 15-30 mol. %; p = 1-10 mol. %; q = 1-3; q = 1 if X = a single bond.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein negativ arbeitendes, strahlungsempfindliches Gemisch, das ein organisches polymeres Bindemittel und eine Substanz, die Strahlungsenergie in Wärme umwandelt, enthält, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das polymere Bindemittel im wesentlichen aus Einheiten der Formel (I) <IMAGE> besteht, wobei R<1>: ein Wasserstoffatom oder einen (C1-C4)Alkylrest, X: eine Einfachbindung oder einen (q+1)-wertigen Rest eines (C4-C10)Alkans, in dem einzelne Methylengruppen durch Heteroatome ersetzt sein können, eines (C2-C8)Alkens oder eines isocyclischen oder heterocyclischen, gesättigten oder ungesättigten, mono- oder polycyclischen (C6-C10)Ringes oder Ringsystems, n: 40 bis 80 mol-%, m: 15 bis 30 mol-%, p: 1 bis 10 mol-% und; q: eine ganze Zahl von 1 bis 3, wobei q gleich 1 ist, wenn X eine Einfachbindung ist, darstellt und das polymere Bindemittel eine Säurezahl von 5 bis 150 aufweist. Außerdem betrifft die Erfindung ein Aufzeichnungsmaterial mit einem Träger und einer Schicht aus diesem Gemisch sowie ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Farbprüffolie.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/36; G03F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/038 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01); G03F 3/10 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/004 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1008 (2013.01); B41M 5/368 (2013.01); G03F 3/102 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/06 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01); Y10S 430/106 (2013.01); Y10S 430/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993966 A1 20000419; EP 0993966 B1 20030514; DE 19847033 A1 20000420; JP 2000206693 A 20000728; US 6303267 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905541

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030514

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT NAAMLOZE VENNOOTSCHAP

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI