Global Patent Index - EP 0993967 A2

EP 0993967 A2 2000-04-19 - Book

Title (en)

Book

Title (de)

Buch

Title (fr)

Livre

Publication

EP 0993967 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119867 A

Priority

DE 29818456 U

Abstract (en)

The book consists of a book block (1) and a cover (2), the inside of which is glued to the front and rear of the book block. The cover consists of a one-piece card cutout. The front and rear leaves of the book block may be glued to the inside of the cover. The cutout may be grooved at the height of the long edges on the adhesion side.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Buch, bestehend aus einem Buchblock (1) und einer Buchdecke (3), deren Innenseite mit der Vorder- und der Rückseite des Buchblocks (1) verleimt ist, wird zur Senkung der Herstellungskosten vorgeschlagen, die Buchdecke (2) aus einem einstückigen Kartonzuschnitt herzustellen. Die Außenseiten der Vorsatz- und Hintersatzblätter (3) können mit der Innenseite der Buchdecke (2) verleimt sein. Der Kartonzuschnitt, der die Buchdecke (2) bildet, kann außerdem in Höhe der bundseitigen Längsränder des Buchblocks (1) genutet sein. Das Erscheingungsbild eines derart gebundenen Buches ist demjenigen eines Hardcover-Buches dann sehr stark angenähert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 1/02 (2006.01); B42D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 3/00 (2013.01); B42D 1/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29818456 U1 19990204; EP 0993967 A2 20000419; EP 0993967 A3 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 42D 1/00 A, 7B 42D 1/02 B, 7B 42D 3/00 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI