Global Patent Index - EP 0993968 A1

EP 0993968 A1 2000-04-19 - Process for decorating an object

Title (en)

Process for decorating an object

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Dekorieren eines Gegenstandes

Title (fr)

Procédé pour décorer un objet

Publication

EP 0993968 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98119330 A

Priority

EP 98119330 A

Abstract (en)

A decor layer is applied to a surface of polyolefin film. Film and decor are applied to the object, decor under film. Decor and film are heated, so that color molecules of the decor diffuse into the film. Preferred features: The decor is transferred from a support with release characteristics, onto the film. A primer layer is applied over the decor onto the sheet. This is brought onto the object under the decor, in the application stage. The primer has adhesive characteristics. It is a melt adhesive. It has thermoplastic characteristics. It may employ an adhesive activated by heat or radiation. The primer contains a color. The sheet is applied at 120 degrees C- 250 degrees C to the object, especially in the form of an encasement. Paint is applied to the sheet; this is electron beam-hardened. The primer is activated, especially in respect of its adhesive characteristics, by the electron beam. The object is wood or a wooden material.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zum Dekorieren von insbesondere Gegenständen aus Holz oder einem Holzwerkstoff sieht folgende Schritte vor: Übertragen eines Farbdekors von einem Träger mit "Release"-Eigenschaft auf eine Polyolefin-Folie, Auflegen der Folie mit dem Dekor auf den Gegenstand so, daß das Dekor unter der Folie liegt, und Erwärmen des Dekors und der Folie, so daß Farbmoleküle des Dekors in die Folie diffundieren.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 1/17; B05D 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/1712 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993968 A1 20000419; EP 0993968 B1 20030115; DE 59806946 D1 20030220; ES 2189065 T3 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071013

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051004

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061014

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061014

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061013

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-07-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061013

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051004

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2189065

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806946

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020411

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI