Global Patent Index - EP 0994017 A1

EP 0994017 A1 2000-04-19 - Prefabricated cabin for a vessel and installation method for such cabin in a vessel

Title (en)

Prefabricated cabin for a vessel and installation method for such cabin in a vessel

Title (de)

Vorgefertigter Wohnraum für ein Schiff und Installationsverfahren für einen solchen Wohnraum in einem Schiff

Title (fr)

Local d'habitation préfabriqué pour un navire et procédé d'installation de tels locaux dans un navire

Publication

EP 0994017 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402447 A

Priority

FR 9813043 A

Abstract (en)

The prefabricated dwelling cabin for a marine vessel has wall (2a-d), a floor and a ceiling (1) formed by assembly of enclosure panels. The ceiling has panels of insulating material (8a) with a thickening (d) compared to the remainder of the panel.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un local d'habitation préfabriqué destiné à être installé dans un navire caractérisé en ce qu'il présente des parois formant murs (2a,2b,2c,2d), plafond et plancher (1), réalisées par l'assemblage de panneaux emboîtables, ledit plancher (1) étant constitué par l'association de panneaux pourvus d'un matériau isolant (8a) présentant une surépaisseur (d) par rapport au reste dudit panneau. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 29/02; B63B 3/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 9/00 (2006.01); B63B 3/68 (2006.01); B63B 9/06 (2006.01); B63B 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 29/025 (2013.01); B63B 3/68 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994017 A1 20000419; EP 0994017 B1 20031203; DE 69913288 D1 20040115; DE 69913288 T2 20041125; FR 2784650 A1 20000421; FR 2784650 B1 20010112; JP 2000118486 A 20000425; KR 100611691 B1 20060811; KR 20000029018 A 20000525; US 6260496 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151006

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69913288

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141020

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141010

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-12-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STX FRANCE S.A., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AKER YARDS CABINS, MONTOIR DE BRETAGNE, FR

- Document: DE 69913288

- Effective date: 20131105

2013-12-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69913288

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20131105

2013-12-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69913288

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20131105

2013-11-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69913288

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2006-10-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061006

2005-09-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050916

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913288 P 20040115

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM HOLDINGS

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI