Global Patent Index - EP 0994018 A1

EP 0994018 A1 2000-04-19 - Method for mounting a wall panel onto the wall of a ship's cabin

Title (en)

Method for mounting a wall panel onto the wall of a ship's cabin

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Montage eines Wandpaneels auf der Wand einer Schiffskabine

Title (fr)

Procédé de montage d'un cloisonnement sur une paroi de local d'habitation de navire

Publication

EP 0994018 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402448 A

Priority

FR 9813042 A

Abstract (en)

The method of fitting a partition to a marine vessel cabin wall (21) involves fitting connectors (22,31) to the foot and head of the wall and fixing the partition panels to the upper and lower connectors. The partition can form part of a gangway.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de montage d'un cloisonnement sur une paroi (21) de local d'habitation de navire déjà montée, ledit cloisonnement étant constitué par une pluralité de panneaux (23), caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend les étapes consistant à: poser et fixer au moins un élément (22) de raccord au pied de ladite paroi (21); poser et fixer au moins un élément de raccord à la tête de ladite paroi (21); et, poser et fixer successivement lesdits panneaux (23) sur lesdits éléments de raccord. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 29/02; B63B 3/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 9/00 (2006.01); B63B 3/68 (2006.01); B63B 9/06 (2006.01); B63B 29/02 (2006.01); E04B 2/56 (2006.01); E04F 13/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/68 (2013.01); B63B 29/025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994018 A1 20000419; EP 0994018 B1 20040506; DE 69916961 D1 20040609; DE 69916961 T2 20050421; FR 2784649 A1 20000421; FR 2784649 B1 20001222; JP 2000118485 A 20000425; KR 100611690 B1 20060811; KR 20000029017 A 20000525; US 6357198 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101006

2011-09-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69916961

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071006

2007-01-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-01-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-09-19 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916961 P 20040609

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR IT

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM HOLDINGS

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI