Global patent index - EP 0994029 A1

EP 0994029 A1 2000-04-19 - Apparatus for generating reciprocating movements

Title (en)

Apparatus for generating reciprocating movements

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung hin- und hergehender Bewegungen

Title (fr)

Appareil de génération de mouvements alternatifs

Publication

EP 0994029 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120137 A

Priority

DE 19847433 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has transmission elements that drive a drive element or sliding element (24,25). The transmission elements perform only rotational motion or can move along circular paths of motion. The linearly moving drive elements are connected to transmission elements, esp. via levers (37), whereby the region of the connection between a lever and sliding element can only move along a straight path.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung bzw. Getriebe zur Erzeugung von linearen Bewegungen für Schieber, Mitnehmer und ähnliche Organe, insbesondere bei hin- und hergehender Bewegung. Die Schieber (24, 25) oder dergleichen sind mit einem Getriebe (33) verbunden, bei dem ausschließlich drehende bzw. umlaufende Organe verwendet werden. Jeder Schieber (24, 25) ist mit einem Hebel (37) verbunden, der durch das Getriebe so bewegt wird, dass die Verbindung des Hebels (37) mit dem Schieber (24, 25) ausschließlich auf einer geradlinigen Bahn bewegt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 35/20; B65B 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/02 (2006.01); B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65B 35/20 (2006.01); B65G 25/00 (2006.01); B65G 47/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/225 (2013.01); B65B 35/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2462686 C2 19850801

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994029 A1 20000419; EP 0994029 B1 20090311; BR 9904683 A 20000829; BR 9904683 B1 20101019; CN 1251888 A 20000503; CN 1263653 C 20060712; DE 19847433 A1 20000420; DE 59914975 D1 20090423; JP 2000157244 A 20000613; JP 3964582 B2 20070822; US 6328152 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151008

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151008

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151008

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141010

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141008

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-02-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20091214

2009-08-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-04-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914975

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-04-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-03-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2009-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2009-03-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031222

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031222

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI