Global Patent Index - EP 0994032 A1

EP 0994032 A1 2000-04-19 - Safety drive unit in combination with a movable of protection screen, particularly in manufacturing machines

Title (en)

Safety drive unit in combination with a movable of protection screen, particularly in manufacturing machines

Title (de)

Sicherheits-Antriebseinheit in Kombination mit einem Schutzschirm, insbesondere für Herstellungsmaschinen

Title (fr)

Unité d'entraînement à sécurité en combinaison avec un écran de protection, notamment pour des machines de fabrication

Publication

EP 0994032 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120332 A

Priority

IT SV980059 A

Abstract (en)

Safety drive unit, in particular for the movement of protection screens in manufacturing machines the said unit comprising at least one drive motor (25, 26) that drives a support of the motion (7) of an element of cover and/or protection (5, 205). According to the invention, the transmission between the drive motor (25, 26) and the protection screen (5, 205) is formed by a pair of helical gears (22, 23) engaged between each other with the corresponding external helical threads (122, 122', 123, 123'), the said helical gears (22, 23) being made in such a manner, that the rotation of the helical drive gear (23) in the two directions engages the rotation in the two directions of the other helical driven gear (22), whereas a rotation of the driven helical gear (22) engages a locking underpinning of the same in or with the helical drive gear (23) which prevents the rotation. The invention relates also to a protection screen equipped with such a drive unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 57/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 57/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 57/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994032 A1 20000419; EP 0994032 B1 20040331; DE 69915964 D1 20040506; DE 69915964 T2 20041028; IT 1305420 B1 20010504; IT SV980059 A1 20000414; IT SV980059 D0 19981014

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041012

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041012

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69915964

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-10-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SAFETY DRIVE UNIT IN COMBINATION WITH A MOVABLE OF PROTECTION SCREEN, PARTICULARLY IN MANUFACTURING MACHINES

2003-09-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SAFETY DRIVE UNIT IN COMBINATION WITH A MOVABLE OF PROTECTION SCREEN, PARTICULARLY IN MANUFACTURING MACHINES

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SASIB S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI