Global Patent Index - EP 0994033 A1

EP 0994033 A1 2000-04-19 - Modular manufacturing machine

Title (en)

Modular manufacturing machine

Title (de)

Modulare Herstellungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine modulaire de fabrication

Publication

EP 0994033 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120331 A

Priority

IT SV980055 A

Abstract (en)

The individual segments (103, 203, 303) of a tubular wireway (3) extending itself along the machine and designed to contain electrical cables and/or pipelines for fluids, or similar, are asscociated with and fixed each to a module (101, 102, 103) of the bed (1) and each provided with at least one branch (133, 233, 333) for the passage of the electrical cables and/or pipelines for fluids, or similar that connect the working unit or units mounted on their respective module (101, 102, 103) of the bed (1), with other parts of the machine or installations, in which the machine is integrated, such as supply and/or control units, or similar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 59/04; B65B 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 59/04 (2006.01); B65B 65/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A24C (2006.01); B65B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/00 (2013.01); B65B 1/00 (2013.01); B65B 59/04 (2013.01); B65B 65/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994033 A1 20000419; EP 0994033 B1 20030129; DE 69905115 D1 20030306; DE 69905115 T2 20030925; IT 1305416 B1 20010504; IT SV980055 A1 20000414; IT SV980055 D0 19981014

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041012

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041012

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-12-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031217

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031003

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69905115

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SASIB S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI