Global patent index - EP 0994035 A1

EP 0994035 A1 2000-04-19 - One-piece plastic transport crate

Title (en)

One-piece plastic transport crate

Title (de)

Einstückig aus Kunststoff hergestellter Transportkasten

Title (fr)

Caisse de transport monobloc en plastique

Publication

EP 0994035 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118222 A

Priority

DE 19844014 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19844014C1] The moulded plastics cargo container has integral runners (5) which have a wider longitudinal section (15) on their outer upper faces. The container base, adjacent to the edges, has upwardly sloped faces (17) above the runners. The angle of the floor adjacent to the edges matches the upper slope of the runners.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen einstückig aus Kunststoff hergestellter Transportkasten mit einem im mittleren Bereich des Kastens ebenen Boden (4), unter dem sich im Randbereich des Kastens mindestens zwei parallele Kufen (5) befinden, die durch quer zu den Kufen (5) verlaufende Rippen (6) mit dem Boden (4) verbunden sind, bei dem durch die Kufen (5), die Querrippen (6) und die Bodenunterfläche nach außen und/oder innen hin offene Taschen (7) gebildet sind, und bei dem die Kufen (5) an der der Kastenmitte zugewandten Seite einen längsgerichteten Abschnitt (15) aufweisen, der nach oben gerichtet ist. Die Erfindung besteht darin, daß die Kufen (5) an ihrer Außenseite einen weiteren längsgerichteten Abschnitt (15) aufweisen, der nach oben gerichtet ist, und daß der Boden (4) des Kastens im Randbereich eine nach unten gerichtete geneigte Fläche (17) aufweist, die oberhalb der Kufen (5) befindlich ist, die die gleiche Neigung wie der nach außen gerichtete längsgerichtete Abschnitt (15) der Kufe (5) aufweist und die in die mittig angeordnete ebene Bodenfläche (16) übergeht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19844014 C1 20000120; AT 233696 T 20030315; DK 0994035 T3 20030707; EP 0994035 A1 20000419; EP 0994035 B1 20030305; ES 2194409 T3 20031116; PT 994035 E 20030731

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030914

2006-09-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060914

2006-03-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050914

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030915

2004-10-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-06-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-05-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2004-05-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030914

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINPAC STUCKI KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNG G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2194409

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030914

2003-09-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030914

2003-09-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030914

2003-09-14 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030914

2003-07-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030402079

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-07-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904429

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020426

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI