Global Patent Index - EP 0994044 A1

EP 0994044 A1 2000-04-19 - Apparatus for receiving pourable materials

Title (en)

Apparatus for receiving pourable materials

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Aufnahme schüttfähiger Stoffe

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour recevoir produits pulvérents

Publication

EP 0994044 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810947 A

Priority

EP 98810947 A

Abstract (en)

A storage container (3) with flexible sleeve is fixed on a frame (2). The sleeve is ready made with a frusto-conical end at the opening end and is anchored on the outer side of a complementary shaped tension pipe (5) by a tension device (6) which encloses the opening end area. The tension pipe can be used as a filling and empting opening for the container and has a cylindrical neck section adjoining the frusto-conical shaped tension area on the outside.

Abstract (de)

Eine Einrichtung (1) zur Aufnahme oder Zwischenlagerung von schüttfähigen Stoffen, besteht aus einem in einem Gestell (2) befestigten Lagerbehälter (3), der aus einem flexiblen Mantel gebildet ist und an einem Ende eine mit einer Befestigungsanordnung (10) verbundene Befüll- und Entleerungsöffnung aufweist, wobei der Mantel des Lagerbehälters (3) im öffnungsseitigen Endbereich kegelstumpfförmig ausgebildet und mittels einer den Endbereich umfassenden Spannvorrichtung (6) an der Aussenseite eines komplementären Aufspannstutzens (5) verankert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/30; B65D 88/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/28 (2006.01); B65D 88/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/30 (2013.01); B65D 88/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994044 A1 20000419; EP 0994044 B1 20030129; AT 231814 T 20030215; DE 59807076 D1 20030306

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030922

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ZIMMERMANN FRITZ

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-03-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-12-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807076 P 20030306

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010711

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI