Global Patent Index - EP 0994055 A2

EP 0994055 A2 2000-04-19 - Device for the transfer of double-sided adhesive joining material

Title (en)

Device for the transfer of double-sided adhesive joining material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von doppelseitig haftendem Verbindungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le transfert d'un matériaux de liaison double face

Publication

EP 0994055 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118834 A

Priority

DE 19847800 A

Abstract (en)

The device includes a contact pressure guide mechanism (18) movable between a rest position where the carrier material (26) is spaced from the substrate, and a work position where the mechanism brings the carrier material with its side holding the connecting material section-wise against the substrate. An engagement element (28) can be brought between a rest position where it is out of engagement with the substrate, and an engagement position where it is in engagement with the substrate so that it can only be returned from its engagement position to its rest position after the contact guide mechanism has left its work position. The device can have a supply reel (22) and empty reel (24) with a brake acting on the supply reel

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (16) zur Übertragung eines doppelseitig haftenden Verbindungsmaterials, insbesondere bestehend aus voneinander beabstandeten Verbindungsblättchen, von einem das Verbindungsmaterial aufnehmenden, insbesondere streifenförmigen, Trägermaterial (26) auf ein Substrat, insbesondere auf eine Materialbahn zum Verbinden mit einer anderen Materialbahn, mit einer Andrückführungseinrichtung zum Führen des Trägermaterials (26) und Andrücken des Trägermaterials (26) auf das Substrat. Das Besondere der Erfindung ist darin zu sehen, daß die Andrückführungseinrichtung zwischen einer Ruhestellung, in der sich das Trägermaterial (26) in einem Abstand vom Substrat befindet, und einer Arbeitsstellung, in der die Andrückführungseinrichtung das Trägermaterial (26) mit seiner das Verbindungsmaterial aufnehmenden Vorderseite abschnittsweise in Anlage an das Substrat bringt, bewegbar gelagert ist und ein Eingriffselement (28) vorgesehen ist, das zwischen einer Ruhestellung, in der es sich außer Eingriff vom Substrat befindet, und einer Eingriffsstellung, in der es sich in Eingriff mit dem Substrat befindet, derart verbringbar ist, daß es von seiner Eingriffsstellung in seine Ruhestellung nur zurückführbar ist, nachdem die Andrückführungseinrichtung ihre Arbeitsstellung verlassen hat. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/10; B65H 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/18 (2006.01); B65H 19/10 (2006.01); B65H 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/102 (2013.01); B65H 37/002 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1707 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994055 A2 20000419; EP 0994055 A3 20010307; CN 1252374 A 20000510; DE 19847800 A1 20000420; JP 2000118809 A 20000425; PL 335928 A1 20000425; US 6422282 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI