Global Patent Index - EP 0994055 A3

EP 0994055 A3 2001-03-07 - Device for the transfer of double-sided adhesive joining material

Title (en)

Device for the transfer of double-sided adhesive joining material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von doppelseitig haftendem Verbindungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le transfert d'un matériaux de liaison double face

Publication

EP 0994055 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118834 A

Priority

DE 19847800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0994055A2] The device includes a contact pressure guide mechanism (18) movable between a rest position where the carrier material (26) is spaced from the substrate, and a work position where the mechanism brings the carrier material with its side holding the connecting material section-wise against the substrate. An engagement element (28) can be brought between a rest position where it is out of engagement with the substrate, and an engagement position where it is in engagement with the substrate so that it can only be returned from its engagement position to its rest position after the contact guide mechanism has left its work position. The device can have a supply reel (22) and empty reel (24) with a brake acting on the supply reel

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/10; B65H 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/18 (2006.01); B65H 19/10 (2006.01); B65H 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/102 (2013.01); B65H 37/002 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1707 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994055 A2 20000419; EP 0994055 A3 20010307; CN 1252374 A 20000510; DE 19847800 A1 20000420; JP 2000118809 A 20000425; PL 335928 A1 20000425; US 6422282 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI