Global Patent Index - EP 0994057 B1

EP 0994057 B1 2003-06-18 - Supply unit of bobbins of wrapping material in a cigarette packing machine and process for pick-up and transfer of the same bobbins

Title (en)

Supply unit of bobbins of wrapping material in a cigarette packing machine and process for pick-up and transfer of the same bobbins

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zuführen von Rollen aus Einschlagmaterial in einer Zigarettenverpackungsmaschine und Verfahren zum Aufnehmen und Transportieren dieser Rollen

Title (fr)

Unité d'alimentation de bobines de matériau d'emballage dans une machine d'emballage de cigarettes et méthode pour prélever et transférer ces bobines

Publication

EP 0994057 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120328 A

Priority

IT SV980058 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0994057A1] The invention relates to a supply unit of bobbins (2) of materials, in particular of bobbins of wrapping material in form of a band and in the cigarette packing machines, comprising a bobbin carrier reservoir (11) equipped with means of supplying the bobbins to a pick-up station and a pick-up device (15) that transfers the bobbins from said reservoir onto the mandrel (107) unwinding the same, as the path of the bobbin to the pick-up station and the one of the pick-up device are paths intersecting each other and sensors being provided on the pick-up device to detect at least two sections or points diametrically opposed of the external perimeter and/or internal perimeter of the bobbin in the pick-up station, whereas the signals of the sensors are fed to a box that controls the drive of the motion of the bobbin itself and/or of the pick-up device. The invention also relates to a process of pick-up and transfer of the same bobbins. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/123 (2013.01); B65H 2301/3251 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41324 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41722 (2013.01); B65H 2405/462 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994057 A1 20000419; EP 0994057 B1 20030618; DE 69908882 D1 20030724; DE 69908882 T2 20040519; IT 1305419 B1 20010504; IT SV980058 A1 20000414; IT SV980058 D0 19981014

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041012

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041012

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031008

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908882 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SASIB S.P.A.

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020510

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI