Global Patent Index - EP 0994058 A1

EP 0994058 A1 2000-04-19 - Automatic winding machine for continuously extruded plastic films

Title (en)

Automatic winding machine for continuously extruded plastic films

Title (de)

Automatische Wickelmaschine für kontinuierlich extrudrierte Plastikfolien

Title (fr)

Machine d'enroulage automatique pour des films plastiques extrudés en continu

Publication

EP 0994058 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830610 A

Priority

EP 98830610 A

Abstract (en)

An automatic winding machine to be combined with a continuous extrusion plant of a plastic film (F) includes a motor-driven winding roller (M) on which the film (F) passes and a cutting unit (T) parallel to the roller (M) and rotatable therearound, the cutting unit (T) including a blade (L) to cut transversely the film (F) and also a blowing bar (S) connected to a source of pressurized fluid and controlled by a valve in order to push the terminal edge (E) of the film (F), cut by the blade (L), so that it winds up on a new winding core (A). This novel structure of the cutting unit (T) provides for an automatic change of the complete reel (C) both when the winding takes place in the usual direction with the film (F) passing over the roller (M) and when the winding takes place in the reverse direction with the film (F) passing under the roller (M). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/26; B65H 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2261 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41893 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5151 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51532 (2013.01); B65H 2403/942 (2013.01); B65H 2406/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994058 A1 20000419

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020716

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI