Global Patent Index - EP 0994061 A3

EP 0994061 A3 2000-07-05 - Winding method and apparatus

Title (en)

Winding method and apparatus

Title (de)

Wickelverfahren und Apparat

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de bobinage

Publication

EP 0994061 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99307962 A

Priority

GB 9822412 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0994061A2] There is disclosed a method of winding a yarn onto a package, comprising traversing the running yarn adjacent the package by means of a yarn guide connected to a traversing member, applying a primary reciprocating motion to the traversing member to cause a corresponding motion of the yarn guide, and superimposing on the motion of the yarn guide a secondary reciprocating motion to produce a linked harmonic traverse motion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/28; B65H 54/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/02 (2006.01); B65H 54/28 (2006.01); B65H 57/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2818 (2013.01); B65H 54/2821 (2013.01); B65H 54/2833 (2013.01); B65H 54/2893 (2013.01); B65H 54/386 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994061 A2 20000419; EP 0994061 A3 20000705; GB 2345300 A 20000705; GB 9822412 D0 19981209; JP 2000118865 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010109

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65H 54/28 A, 7B 65H 54/38 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI