Global patent index - EP 0994063 A1

EP 0994063 A1 2000-04-19 - Support core for rolls of continuous sheet materials, particularly for the paper industry

Title (en)

Support core for rolls of continuous sheet materials, particularly for the paper industry

Title (de)

Kern für Rolle von Endlosschichtmaterialien insbesondere für die Papierindustrie

Title (fr)

Noyau de support pour rouleaux de feuilles de matériaux continus, en particulier pour l'industrie papetière

Publication

EP 0994063 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830601 A

Priority

IT LU980013 A

Abstract (en)

A support core for rolls of continuous sheet materials made of a plastic material comprising HD polyethylene with a flame retardant additive and fillers such as calcium carbonate, talc and carbon block.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/10 (2013.01); B65H 2701/5122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994063 A1 20000419; IT 1305928 B1 20010521; IT LU980013 A1 20000417; IT LU980013 D0 19981016

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021014

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI