Global Patent Index - EP 0994067 A2

EP 0994067 A2 2000-04-19 - Method and divice for filling plastic bottles

Title (en)

Method and divice for filling plastic bottles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Befüllen von Flaschen aus Kunststoff

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour remplir des bouteilles en plastique

Publication

EP 0994067 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98810942 A

Priority

EP 98810942 A

Abstract (en)

Method and device for filling plastic bottles whereby a dispensing/suction nozzle (1) is inserted into the mouth (2) at the top of a bottle. The nozzle (1) dispenses a liquid to fill the bottle and at the same time sucks out the air contained inside the said bottle. As the bottle is filled, the nozzle (1) has a frustoconical surface (6), which is made of steel, that fits tightly against an edge of the mouth (2), forming an air-tight seal around the said mouth by virtue of which seal the pressure inside the bottle can be less than the pressure in the external environment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/00 (2006.01); B67C 3/16 (2006.01); B67C 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/2634 (2013.01); B67C 3/16 (2013.01); B67C 2003/266 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994067 A2 20000419; EP 0994067 A3 20000426; EP 0994067 B1 20031126; AU 4882799 A 20000323; AU 751419 B2 20020815; BR 9904280 A 20000912; CA 2282799 A1 20000321; DE 69820063 D1 20040108; DE 69820063 T2 20040826; JP 2000095297 A 20000404; KR 20000023338 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040921

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-09-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820063 P 20040108

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-11-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031126

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI