Global Patent Index - EP 0994195 A2

EP 0994195 A2 2000-04-19 - Process for waterproofing chromium tanned bovine hides

Title (en)

Process for waterproofing chromium tanned bovine hides

Title (de)

Verfahren um chromgegerbte Rinderhäute wasserbeständig zu machen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour rendre des peaux bovines tannées au chrome résistantes à l'eau

Publication

EP 0994195 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99118746 A

Priority

PT 10221198 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention regards a process for making hides waterproof and water repellent, comprising: a first washing step in a solution of water and formic acid; a step for freeing the hides from acid in a solution of water, sodium formate, neutrigan, DENSODRIN LD 6359 and DENSODRIN CD; a re-tanning and greasing step in a solution of water, powdered mimosa tannin, powedered Basyntan SL, Lipoderm Licker SLW, DENSODRIN LD 6359 and DENSODRIN CD and formic acid; a dyeing step in cold water and dye and, finally, a fixing step in water and Chromitan MSN. The use of a suitable proportion of these compounds permits to make the hides waterproof and water repellent, without, however, altering the hide surface, which then can undergo subsequent finishing treatments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14C 3/28 (2006.01); C14C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14C 3/28 (2013.01); C14C 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994195 A2 20000419; EP 0994195 A3 20011004; JP 2000119700 A 20000425; PT 102211 A 20000428; PT 102211 B 20031031

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020405

2002-08-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 14C 3/28 A, 7C 14C 9/02 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI