Global Patent Index - EP 0994204 A1

EP 0994204 A1 2000-04-19 - Dispositif d'élimination du fil de sous-renvidage des broches sur un métier continu à filer ou à retordre

Title (en)

Dispositif d'élimination du fil de sous-renvidage des broches sur un métier continu à filer ou à retordre

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Beseitigen von Unterwindungen an Spindeln einer Spinn- oder Zwirnmaschine

Title (fr)

Device for removing underwound yarn wraps from spindles of spinning or twisting machines

Publication

EP 0994204 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99402471 A

Priority

FR 9812742 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanism (15) moves radially relative to the spindle, carried directly on a carriage (24). This has a slide (26) of which the front face (27) comes into contact with the spindle. This face defines the relative radial location between spindle and mechanism. Preferred features: The slide is spring- (25) loaded against the spindle. The flange raises the slide towards the spindle. The flange resists sliding wear. It contacts the spindle, not by its front face (27), but by two rollers. A suction nozzle carried near the knife, is connected to an extraction system able to remove the underwound thread immediately following cutting. The mechanism is cleared of thread pneumatically, including any pieces of it. A blower jet assists removal from the spindle, directing thread into a suction opening. The mechanism includes teeth forming a claw, and a tool with rough, sharp or abrasive projections. Teeth are distributed in rows and columns, running radially and axially with respect to the spindle. The equipment is further detailed.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif pour l'élimination du fil de sous-renvidage des broches 2 sur un métier continu à filer ou à retordre 1, ce métier comportant une multiplicité de broches alignées sur au moins une face du métier, ce dispositif comportant un couteau 9 porté par un support 14 et agencé pour couper le fil de sous-renvidage de chaque broche entre la bobine en cours de formation portée par cette broche et les spires de sous-renvidage formées sur la broche, au-dessous de la bobine, caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte au surplus des moyens mécaniques 15 portés par le support à un niveau en hauteur situé au-dessous de celui du couteau 9 et agencés pour venir en contact direct avec les spires de sous-renvidage, après la coupe du fil de sous-renvidage par le couteau et alors que la broche tourne pour la formation de la bobine en cours, pour déchiqueter ou au moins arracher ou détruire le fil des spires de sous-renvidage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/385 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994204 A1 20000419; FR 2784397 A1 20000414; FR 2784397 B1 20001222

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020516

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR IT

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-06-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR REMOVING UNDERWOUND YARN WRAPS FROM SPINDLES OF SPINNING OR TWISTING MACHINES

2000-06-14 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-06-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR REMOVING UNDERWOUND YARN WRAPS FROM SPINDLES OF SPINNING OR TWISTING MACHINES

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI