Global Patent Index - EP 0994206 A1

EP 0994206 A1 2000-04-19 - Yarn heat treatment device

Title (en)

Yarn heat treatment device

Title (de)

Heizer für Garne

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chauffage pour fils

Publication

EP 0994206 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99118819 A

Priority

JP 29328798 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a method in which a yarn heat treatment device having yarn guides 27 is provided in a heating space in a non-contact type heater H1, having disposed therein a means 28, 28a operating when a yarn 3 is broken and injecting compressed air in the direction in which the yarn 3 is separated from the yarn guides 27. The present invention has disposed therein a means 28, 28a operating upon a yarn broken to inject compressed air in the direction in which the yarn is separated from the yarn guides, so upon a yarn broken, the yarn can be instantaneously separated from the yarn guides and prevented from melting and sticking to the yarn guides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02J 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/02 (2006.01); D02J 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02J 13/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] EP 0442368 A1 19910821 - TEIJIN SEIKI CO LTD [JP]
  • [DA] EP 0429980 A1 19910605 - BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]
  • [A] US 3972127 A 19760803 - HOSHI TOYOHIKO, et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 252 (C - 0844) 26 June 1991 (1991-06-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 12 26 December 1996 (1996-12-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 12 26 December 1996 (1996-12-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 09 30 September 1996 (1996-09-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 08 29 September 1995 (1995-09-29)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994206 A1 20000419; JP 2000119923 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010911

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI