Global Patent Index - EP 0994212 A1

EP 0994212 A1 2000-04-19 - Helical shearing blade

Title (en)

Helical shearing blade

Title (de)

Scherwendel

Title (fr)

Lame hélicoidale de tondeuse

Publication

EP 0994212 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120127 A

Priority

DE 19846575 A

Abstract (en)

The arc-shaped cuts (13) are located on the breast plane of the coil (3) which adjoins the cutter on the narrow coil side. The depth of the cuts (13) measured vertically to the breast plane is at least as great as the width of the cuts (13) measured in parallel to the coil cutter.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Scherwendel (3) für den Scherzylinder (2) einer Schermaschine zum Scheren einer Stoffbahn (8) beschrieben. Die Schneide (6) der Scherwendel (3) soll so ausgebildet werden, daß die Transportgeschwindigkeit der zu scherenden Stoffbahn (8) und/oder die Schneidtiefe des Flors (9)- auch bei dichtem Flor - gegenüber dem Stand der Technik wesentlich erhöht werden kann und trotzdem ein gleichmäßig geschorener Flor (9) erhalten wird. Erfindungsgemäß werden die Hiebe (13) als bogenförmige Ausnehmungen der Brustfläche (14) der Scherwendel (3) ausgebildet. Bevorzugt soll die Tiefe der Hiebe (13) senkrecht zu der Brustfläche (14) größenordnungsmäßig mindestens gleich der parallel zur Schneide (6) der Scherwendel (3) gemessenen Breite der Hiebe (13) gemacht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994212 A1 20000419; EP 0994212 B1 20030402; DE 19846575 C1 20000427; ES 2196694 T3 20031216

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-12-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091009

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101008

2011-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904821

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091008

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091015

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-10-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SUCKER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Free text: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SUCKER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#BLUMENBERGER STRASSE 143-145#41061 MOENCHENGLADBACH (DE)

2005-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Free text: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.#BLUMENBERGER STRASSE 143-145#41061 MOENCHENGLADBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE)

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196694 T3

2003-07-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904821 P 20030508

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI