Global Patent Index - EP 0994218 A2

EP 0994218 A2 2000-04-19 - Collapsible traffic sign

Title (en)

Collapsible traffic sign

Title (de)

Faltbares Verkehrszeichen

Title (fr)

Panneau de signalisation pliable

Publication

EP 0994218 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99402435 A

Priority

FR 9812938 A

Abstract (en)

The foldable road warning signal has a panel (1) with support plates (5,6) fixed to it. The plates have holes (18) perpendicular to the faces 92,3) of the panel. The ends of two U-shaped wire feet (23,24) are received in the holes. The feet can be folded, in the collapsed condition of the signal, against the panel.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un panneau de signalisation pliable. Le panneau de signalisation amovible, comprenant un panneau (1) possédant deux faces principales (2, 3) et des pieds pliables, est caractérisé en ce que deux plaques de maintien (5, 6) sont solidarisées avec le panneau, les faces principales (7, 8) des plaques, munies de perçages (18), étant parallèles entre elles et perpendiculaires aux faces principales (2, 3) du panneau, les extrémités (29) de deux pieds (23, 24), en forme de U, comprenant une base (27) et deux branches (25, 26), sont recourbées et positionnées chacune dans un perçage (18), lesdits pieds pouvant être pliés, en position fermée, contre les faces principales du panneau ou être déployés et maintenus bloqués en position ouverte grâce à des moyens de blocage (14) disposés sur les plaques de maintien (5, 6) et des moyens de déblocage (19) permettant de libérer simultanément les deux pieds des moyens de blocage (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 9/012

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/012 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/688 (2016.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994218 A2 20000419; EP 0994218 A3 20030409; EP 0994218 B1 20051102; AT 308643 T 20051115; DE 69928060 D1 20051208; FR 2784700 A1 20000421; FR 2784700 B1 20041015

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRANCLAIR SIGNALISATION

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2006-06-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-03-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 01/2006: PATENTNUMBER 0994218 SHOULD BE DELETED (SEE EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN 20051228/52).

2006-01-11 [REG GB ERR] ERRATUM

- Free text: NOTIFICATION HAS NOW BEEN RECEIVED FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE THAT THE APPLICATION WAS WITHDRAWN BEFORE THE DATE OF GRANT. THIS CORRECTION WILL BE PUBLISHED IN THE EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN NO. 05/52 DATED 20051228

2006-01-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050928

2005-12-28 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

2005-12-15 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: RECTIFICATION.

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69928060 P 20051208

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-11-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI