Global Patent Index - EP 0994224 A2

EP 0994224 A2 2000-04-19 - Switching mechanism for a switch function in a lock

Title (en)

Switching mechanism for a switch function in a lock

Title (de)

Schaltmechanismus zum Ausführen einer Schaltfunktion eines Schlosses

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de commutation pour une fonction de commutation d'une serrure

Publication

EP 0994224 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119449 A

Priority

DE 29818458 U

Abstract (en)

The door lock mechanism has a normal security system where the door lock may not be released from the outside unless put into an emergency opening condition from inside. This is achieved by a geared electric motor and operating lever which enables a two-part release mechanism to be joined together. The door lock release system (12) consists of two parts (12a,12b) positioned side by side which independently pivot about a centre, turned through square holes (13), each accessible from each side of the door. The inner part (12a) unlatches the door from inside and the outer part (12b) may be turned without affecting the inner part and is therefore unable to unlatch the door lock. A lever (10) abuts another lever (38) on the outer part and may be urged towards it by rotation of an electric motor (30) to engage the outer part lever with a step on the inner part (38a,38b) to lock the two parts together enabling the lock to be released from outside.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Schaltmechanismus zum Ausführen einer Schaltfunktion eines Schlosses, insbesondere eines Einsteckschlosses für Türen, mit wenigstens einem Betätigungsorgan zum Betätigen einer Schalteinheit des Schlosses und einer elektrisch betreibbaren Umsteuereinheit, mittels der das Betätigungsorgan zu einer Umsteuerbewegung zwischen zwei Betriebsstellungen veranlaßbar ist, wobei das Betätigungsorgan und die Umsteuereinheit in das Schloß integrierbar sind, wobei das Betätigungsorgan zumindest zum Halten des Betätigungsorgans in wenigstens einer Betriebsstellung durch die Umsteuereinheit mechanisch beaufschlagbar ist. Die Erfindung betrifft außerdem ein Schließsystem mit einem Schloß, welches mit einem derartigen Schaltmechanismus versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 65/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 47/0676 (2013.01); E05B 65/1086 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0024 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0031 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9823830 A1 19980604 - ILCO UNICAN INC [CA], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29818458 U1 19990107; EP 0994224 A2 20000419; EP 0994224 A3 20031126

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130403

2011-07-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OPERTIS GMBH

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040505

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI