Global Patent Index - EP 0994225 A1

EP 0994225 A1 2000-04-19 - Lock bar exit guide for espagnolette or espagnolette lock

Title (en)

Lock bar exit guide for espagnolette or espagnolette lock

Title (de)

Stangenaustrittsführung für Treibstangen oder Treibstangenschloss

Title (fr)

Guide de sortie de tringle pour crémone ou crémone-serrure

Publication

EP 0994225 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98440216 A

Priority

  • EP 98440216 A
  • EP 98440211 A

Abstract (en)

The long bolt bar outlet guide is in the form of a U-section profile (11) forming a channel (12) which guides the bar end. The guide also houses a positioner (18) for the bar head and a fixing (19) for attaching it to the edge of the door or window.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994225 A1 20000419; EP 0994225 B1 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071008

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051005

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061009

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061009

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061008

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061008

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051005

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153703 T3

2001-02-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-02-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800458 20010201

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990504

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI