Global Patent Index - EP 0994226 A1

EP 0994226 A1 2000-04-19 - Espagnolette or espagnolette lock

Title (en)

Espagnolette or espagnolette lock

Title (de)

Treibstange oder Treibstangenschloss

Title (fr)

Crémone ou crémone-serrure

Publication

EP 0994226 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98440211 A

Priority

EP 98440211 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanism is contained in a housing and comprises at least one operating bar (7) connected by an articulated coupling (14) to a bracket (15) interacting with a control mechanism. The bar (7) is of reduced width (18) where it passes through an aperture (8) in the housing, allowing the bar to pivot through a certain angle as it is operated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/20; E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994226 A1 20000419; EP 0994226 B1 20001227; DE 69800458 D1 20010201; DE 69800458 T2 20010628; DE 69800459 D1 20010201; DE 69800459 T2 20010628; ES 2153702 T3 20010301; ES 2153703 T3 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070921

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060922

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060922

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060921

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-02-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800459

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-01

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990329

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI