Global Patent Index - EP 0994242 A1

EP 0994242 A1 2000-04-19 - Electromagnetic actuator for valve drive in an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Electromagnetic actuator for valve drive in an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Elektromagnetischer Aktuator zur Betätigung eines Brennkraftmaschinen-Hubventiles

Title (fr)

Actionneur électromagnètique pour commande de soupape de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0994242 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118156 A

Priority

DE 19846974 A

Abstract (en)

The actuator has an actuator housing contg. two magnetic coils and an armature that oscillates between them and acts on the valve. The coils are supplied with electrical energy by power electronics according to signals from control electronics. The power electronics are mounted on or in the actuator housing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen elektromagnetischen Aktuator zur Betätigung eines Brennkraftmaschinen-Hubventiles mit einem Aktuatorgehäuse, das neben zwei Magnetspulen einen oszillierend zwischen diesen bewegten Anker, der auf das zu betätigende Hubventil einwirkt, enthält, wobei die Magnetspulen von einer sog. Leistungselektronik entsprechend den Signalen einer sog. Regelungselektronik in gewünschter Weise mit elektrischer Energie versorgt werden. Erfindungsgemäß ist die Leistungselektronik am oder im Aktuatorgehäuse angeordnet. Zusätzlich kann die von einem elektronischen Brennkraftmaschinen-Steuergerät sowie ggf. von einem die Position des Ankers im Aktuator ermittelnden Hubsensor die benötigten Signale erhaltende Regelungselektronik im oder am Aktuatorgehäuse angeordnet sein. Dabei kann das Aktuatorgehäuse mit einer Möglichkeit zum Kühlen desselben und/oder der Leistungselektronik oder der Regelungselektronik versehen sein.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19846974 A1 20000413; EP 0994242 A1 20000419; EP 0994242 B1 20030903; JP 2000130129 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906839

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906839

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130913

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050911

2005-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050911

2004-09-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040909

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906839 P 20031009

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI