Global Patent Index - EP 0994245 A2

EP 0994245 A2 2000-04-19 - Method and device for reducing the load of exhaust gas components of internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Method and device for reducing the load of exhaust gas components of internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verminderung der abgasseitigen Bauteilbelastung von Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la réduction de la charge des composants de système d'échappement des moteurs à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0994245 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120114 A

Priority

DE 19847477 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves setting a fuel-air ratio close to lambda 1 or higher (weaker) for high anticipated exhaust gas temp. using the fuel and air delivery system (64) and blowing cool air into the exhaust gas system (24) close to the combustion chambers of the internal combustion engine (10). The cool air is delivered by a pump (58) mounted on the engine An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Verminderung der abgasseitigen Bauteilbelastung von Brennkraftmaschinen, insbesondere in Kraftfahrzeugen, mit an zumindest einen Zylinderkopf (16) der Brennkraftmaschine anschließender Abgasanlage (24) und einer Kraftstoff und Verbrennungsluft zumessenden Einrichtung (64), die bei zu erwartenden hohen Abgastemperaturen über die Kraftstoff und Verbrennungsluft zumessende Einrichtung ein Kraftstoff-Luft-Verhältnis nahe =1 oder höher (mager) einstellt und die gleichzeitig in das Abgassystem nahe den Brennräumen der Brennkraftmaschine Kühlluft einbläst (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14; F01N 3/02; F02B 37/16; F01N 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/05 (2006.01); F01N 3/22 (2006.01); F01N 3/32 (2006.01); F02B 37/16 (2006.01); F02B 37/18 (2006.01); F02D 35/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/303 (2013.01); F01N 3/05 (2013.01); F01N 3/22 (2013.01); F01N 3/32 (2013.01); F01N 3/323 (2013.01); F01N 3/326 (2013.01); F02B 37/168 (2013.01); F02B 37/18 (2013.01); F02D 35/0038 (2013.01); F02D 41/0007 (2013.01); F01N 3/28 (2013.01); F01N 2270/02 (2013.01); F02D 41/1454 (2013.01); Y02T 10/144 (2013.01); Y02T 10/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994245 A2 20000419; EP 0994245 A3 20021204; EP 0994245 B1 20050608; DE 19847477 A1 20000420; ES 2241220 T3 20051016

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161008

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161008

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912139

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-05-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2241220 T3

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-07-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912139 P 20050714

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-06-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021102

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02D 41/14 A, 7F 01N 3/05 B, 7F 02B 37/16 B, 7F 01N 3/22 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI